EP0149301 - Improved racquetball racquet construction [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.10.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.10.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.11.1989 [1989/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ektelon 8929 Aero Drive San Diego California 92123/2294 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/30] | For all designated states Ektelon 8929 Aero Drive San Diego California 92123/2294 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mortvedt, Raymond L. 10385 Seth Way Santee California 92071 / US | 02 /
Thompson, Stephen M. 3071 Skipper Street San Diego California 92123 / US | [1985/30] | Representative(s) | Spall, Christopher John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/30] | Spall, Christopher John, et al BARKER, BRETTELL & DUNCAN 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 84306796.8 | 05.10.1984 | [1985/30] | Priority number, date | US19830560538 | 12.12.1983 Original published format: US 560538 | [1985/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0149301 | Date: | 24.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0149301 | Date: | 14.08.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0149301 | Date: | 07.12.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A63B49/00 | [1985/30] | CPC: |
A63B49/00 (EP,US);
A63B49/12 (KR);
A63B49/02 (US);
A63B2049/0202 (EP,US);
A63B2049/0203 (EP,US);
A63B2049/0204 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/30] | Title | German: | Raquetballschläger | [1985/30] | English: | Improved racquetball racquet construction | [1985/30] | French: | Raquette de racquetball | [1985/30] | Examination procedure | 13.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/16] | 16.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.12.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.05.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.09.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4280699 (DRAKE CHARLES A); | [A]US4331331 (RODGERS JR ROBERT E) |