EP0138609 - Resin compositions for laminated boards [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.10.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON OIL CO. LTD. 3-12, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1985/17] | For all designated states NIPPON OIL CO. LTD. 3-12, Nishi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hara, Hajime 4-4-11, Fujigaya Kugenuma Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Orii, Shingo 340, Idanakano-cho Nakahara-Ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Oshimi, Fumiaki 422-6, Isogo-cho Yokiohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Araki, Yoshihiko 4-10-13, Minami-Yukigaya Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1985/17] | Representative(s) | Silverman, Warren, et al Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/17] | Silverman, Warren, et al HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 84307064.0 | 16.10.1984 | [1985/17] | Priority number, date | JP19830193353 | 18.10.1983 Original published format: JP 19335383 | [1985/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0138609 | Date: | 24.04.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0138609 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C08L15/00, C08G59/34, C08J5/24, // (C08L15/00, 25:18, 61:06) | [1985/17] | CPC: |
C08G59/027 (EP);
C08J5/244 (EP,US);
C08L15/00 (EP);
C08L25/18 (EP);
C08L61/06 (EP);
H05K1/0326 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C08L15/00, C08L2666/06 (EP);
C08L15/00, C08L2666/14 (EP);
C08L25/18, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C08L61/06, C08L2666/08 (EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/17] | Title | German: | Harzzusammensetzungen für Schichtplatten | [1985/30] | English: | Resin compositions for laminated boards | [1985/17] | French: | Composition résineuse pour panneaux laminés | [1985/30] | File destroyed: | 28.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 19.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/10] | 04.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.06.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/51] | 21.07.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | JP57205419 [ ]; | [X]JP57205419 ; | JP57123 [ ]; | [A]JP57000123 ; | [X]US2851441 (GREENSPAN FRANK P, et al); | [X]US2927094 (WHEELOCK CHARLES E); | [X]FR2451384 (MITSUI TOATSU CHEMICALS [JP]) | [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 56(C-155)(1201), 8th March 1983; & JP - A - 57 205 419 (MATSUSHITA DENKO K.K.) 16-12-1982, & JP57205419 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 56(C-155)(1201), 8th March 1983; & JP-A-57 205 419 (MATSUSHITA DENKO K.K.) 16-12-1982, & JP57205419 A 00000000 | [ ] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 57(C-98)(935), 14th April 1982; & JP - A - 57 123 (MATSUSHITA DENKO K.K.) 05-01-1982, & JP57123 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 57(C-98)(935), 14th April 1982; & JP-A-57 000 123 (MATSUSHITA DENKO K.K.) 05-01-1982, & JP57000123 A 00000000 |