EP0145238 - Laterally adjustable fasteners [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.1990 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.04.1990 [1990/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 8501 West Higgins Road Chicago Illinois 60631-2887 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/25] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 8501 West Higgins Road Chicago, Illinois 60631-2887 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nelson, John Frederick 911 Herr Drive New Lenox Illinois 60451 / US | [1985/25] | Representative(s) | Gordon, Michael Vincent, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [1985/25] | Application number, filing date | 84307566.4 | 02.11.1984 | [1985/25] | Priority number, date | US19830553453 | 21.11.1983 Original published format: US 553453 | [1985/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0145238 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0145238 | Date: | 20.08.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0145238 | Date: | 26.04.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.1986 | Classification | IPC: | F16B5/06, F16B19/02 | [1985/25] | CPC: |
B29C65/0672 (EP,US);
B29C65/069 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/30223 (EP,US);
B29C66/474 (EP,US);
F16B5/0628 (EP,US);
B29C66/112 (EP,US);
B29C66/131 (EP);
B29L2031/727 (EP,US);
Y10S403/14 (EP,US);
Y10T24/309 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45597 (EP,US);
Y10T24/4588 (EP,US);
Y10T24/45937 (EP,US);
Y10T403/1616 (EP,US);
Y10T403/471 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1985/25] | Title | German: | Seitlich verstellbare Befestigungsvorrichtung | [1985/31] | English: | Laterally adjustable fasteners | [1985/25] | French: | Attache ajustable latéralement | [1985/31] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1986 | Examination requested [1986/52] | 20.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 28.06.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/16] | Request for further processing for: | 28.06.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 27.06.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2406231 [ ]; | DE2718170 [ ]; | EP0051351 [ ] (PERFIL EN FRIO SA [ES]) |