EP0141667 - Methods and apparatus for joining superimposed laminar workpieces [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.1987 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIRLEY INSTITUTE Wilmslow Road Didsbury Manchester M20 8RX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | For all designated states SHIRLEY INSTITUTE Wilmslow Road Didsbury Manchester M20 8RX / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Floyd, Kenneth The Shirley Institute Wilmslow Road Didsbury Manchester M20 8RX / GB | [1985/20] | Representative(s) | McNeight, David Leslie Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | McNeight, David Leslie McNeight & Lawrence Regent House Heaton Lane Stockport Cheshire SK4 1BS / GB | Application number, filing date | 84307613.4 | 05.11.1984 | [1985/20] | Priority number, date | GB19830029802 | 08.11.1983 Original published format: GB 8329802 | [1985/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0141667 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0141667 | Date: | 23.04.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1986 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/02 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
B29C66/1122 (EP);
B29C65/02 (EP);
B29C65/0681 (EP);
B29C65/08 (EP);
B29C66/21 (EP);
B29C66/244 (EP);
B29C66/43 (EP);
B29C66/7392 (EP);
B29C66/73921 (EP);
B29C66/81433 (EP);
B29C66/81463 (EP);
B29C66/8244 (EP);
B29C66/83411 (EP);
B29C66/83511 (EP);
B29C66/836 (EP);
B29C66/8362 (EP);
B29C66/8432 (EP);
B29C66/96 (EP);
B29C65/087 (EP);
B29C65/18 (EP);
B29C66/729 (EP);
B29C66/7294 (EP);
B29C66/93451 (EP);
B29C66/939 (EP);
B29L2031/48 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Verbinden von aufeinander liegenden schichtförmigen Werkstücken | [1985/20] | English: | Methods and apparatus for joining superimposed laminar workpieces | [1985/20] | French: | Procédés et dispositif pour joindre des pièces manufacturées laminaires superposées | [1985/20] | File destroyed: | 28.05.1993 | Examination procedure | 27.12.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/27] | 26.01.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1987/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 23.10.1986 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4293367 (KLASEK LADISLAV J, et al); | [X]GB1362200 (ELECTRICITY COUNDIL); | [X]DE1454971 ; | [A]FR2313186 (CALEMARD STATION SERVICE TEXTI [FR]); | [A]FR1314142 (INTERNAT ULTRASONICS); | [A]FR2115456 (BRANSON INSTR [US]); | [A]FR1358645 (PIRELLI PLAST SOCIETA PER AZIO); | [A]FR2134145 (OREAL); | [A]US3936033 (MCELROY ROBERT C); | [A]SU679413 | [A] - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, Week C15, May 211980; & SU - A - 679 413 (SAITKULOV V G) 20-12-1977 |