EP0142961 - Optical fibre cable [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.11.1988 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telephone Cables Limited Chequers Lane Dagenham Essex RM9 6QA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/22] | For all designated states Telephone Cables Limited Chequers Lane Dagenham Essex RM9 6QA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Johnson, Oliver Sanders 'Murrels' 157 Vale Road Northfleet Kent / GB | 02 /
Powell, Robert John Wale 24 Stapenhill Road Wembley Middlesex / GB | [1985/22] | Representative(s) | Kirby, Harold Victor Albert The General Electric Company, p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | [1986/08] |
Former [1985/22] | Kirby, Harold Victor Albert Central Patent Department Wembley Office The General Electric Company, p.l.c. Hirst Research Centre East Lane Wembley Middlesex HA9 7PP / GB | Application number, filing date | 84307664.7 | 07.11.1984 | [1985/22] | Priority number, date | GB19830030621 | 16.11.1983 Original published format: GB 8330621 | [1985/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0142961 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/44, H01B7/28 | [1985/22] | CPC: |
H01B7/2806 (EP,US);
G02B6/4401 (US);
G02B6/4407 (EP,US);
G02B6/4413 (EP,US);
G02B6/44382 (EP,US);
H01B7/282 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [1985/22] | Title | German: | Faseroptisches Kabel | [1985/22] | English: | Optical fibre cable | [1985/22] | French: | Câble à fibre optique | [1985/22] | File destroyed: | 08.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 26.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/41] | 12.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.06.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/52] | 22.07.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1988/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | DE2211042 [ ] (KABEL METALLWERKE GHH); | DE2755568 [ ] (SIEMENS AG); | GB2032678 [ ] (NORDISKE KABEL TRAAD); | CA1079512 [ ] (WALTON BASIL V E, et al); | GB2087589 [ ] (BRITISH TELECOMM) |