Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0147041
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.02.1992 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.04.1992 [1992/16] |
24.11.1991 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.01.1992 [1992/03] |
09.03.1991 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.04.1991 [1991/17] |
06.09.1989 |
First examination report |
|
21.09.1988 |
Change - request for examination |
published on 09.11.1988 [1988/45] |
08.09.1988 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.10.1988 [1988/43] |
16.03.1988 |
Change - representative |
published on 04.05.1988 [1988/18] |
01.03.1988 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.04.1988 [1988/16] |
16.12.1987 |
Publication of search report |
published on 03.02.1988 [1988/05] |
30.11.1987 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.01.1988 [1988/03] |
30.11.1987 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.01.1988 [1988/03] |
16.12.1986 |
Change - applicant |
published on 04.02.1987 [1987/06] |
16.12.1986 |
Change - representative |
published on 04.02.1987 [1987/06] |
30.05.1985 |
Change - German title |
published on 31.07.1985 [1985/31] |
30.05.1985 |
Change - French title |
published on 31.07.1985 [1985/31] |
04.05.1985 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.07.1985 [1985/27] |