Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU571908B | Global Dossier | 28.04.1988 | B2 | AU3564684 | 27.06.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US56427383 | 22.12.1983 | US54627383 | 28.10.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0147041 | Global Dossier | 24.04.1991 | B1 | EP0147041 | 03.02.1988 | A3 | EP0147041 | 03.07.1985 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US56427383 | 22.12.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1222829 | 09.06.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | US56427383 | 22.12.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3484503D1 | 29.05.1991 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US56427383 | 22.12.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0464211B | 14.10.1992 | B2 | JPS60223230 | 07.11.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | US56427383 | 22.12.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4584686 | 22.04.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | US56427383 | 22.12.1983 |