blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0142356

EP0142356 - Analytical method for determining formaldehyde in electroless copper plating bath [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.06.1989
Database last updated on 10.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip27.06.1989No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.08.1989 [1989/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
C. UYEMURA & CO LTD
No 18 Dosho-machi 3-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka / JP
[N/P]
Former [1985/21]For all designated states
C. UYEMURA & CO LTD
No 18 Dosho-machi 3-chome
Higashi-ku Osaka-shi Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kinoshita, Akemi
No. 1-6-2-706 Nakakouike-cho
Higashiosaka-shi Osaka / JP
02 / Araki, Ken
No. 12-3 Tamase-cho
Ibaragi-shi Osaka / JP
03 / Nawafune, Hidemi
No. 38-34 Shinjo-cho 5-chome
Takatsuki-shi Osaka / JP
04 / Mizumoto, Shozo
No. 3-7 Yasukuranaka 4-chome
Takarazuka-shi Hyogo-ken / JP
[1985/21]
Representative(s)Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [1985/21]Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date84307769.409.11.1984
[1985/21]
Priority number, dateJP1983021206611.11.1983         Original published format: JP 21206683
[1985/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0142356
Date:22.05.1985
Language:EN
[1985/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0142356
Date:15.01.1986
Language:EN
[1986/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0142356
Date:31.08.1988
Language:EN
[1988/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.11.1985
ClassificationIPC:G01N31/16
[1985/21]
CPC:
G01N31/164 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1988/35]
Former [1985/21]BE,  CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  IT,  LI,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Analytisches Verfahren zur Bestimmung des Formaldehyds in einem stromlosen kupfermetallisierenden Bad[1988/35]
English:Analytical method for determining formaldehyde in electroless copper plating bath[1985/21]
French:Méthode analytique pour la détermination du formaldéhyde dans un bain de placage de cuivre sans courant[1985/31]
Former [1985/31]Analytisches Verfahren zur Bestimmung des Formaldehyds in einem stromlosen kupfermetallisierendem Bad
Examination procedure17.02.1986Examination requested  [1986/17]
05.11.1987Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.02.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.04.1988Fee for grant paid
16.04.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.06.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1989/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.1986Renewal fee patent year 03
19.11.1987Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]SU721753  ;
 [A]US4310563  (OKA HITOSHI, et al)
 [X]  - JOURNAL OF ANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY OF THE USSR, vol. 37, no. 4, part 2, April 1982, pages 603-605, Plenum Publishing Corporation, New York, US; B.A.SPINTSE et al.: "Selective determination of formaldehyde by the method of oxime formation"
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 93, no. 2, 14th July 1980, page 725, no. 18651t, Columbus, Ohio, US; & SU - A - 721 753 (VEVERIS, A. et al.) 15-03-1980, & SU721753 A 00000000
 [AP]  - INDUSTRIAL LABORATORY, translated from ZAVODSKAYA LABORATORIYA, vol. 50, no. 9, September 1984, pages 841-843, Consultants Bureau, New York, US; B.A.SPINTSE et al.: "Potentiometric determination of formaldehyde and methylol compounds in industrial condensates"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.