EP0142966 - Valved closure for kegs or casks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1988 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH, LI | published on 28.06.1989 [1989/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALUMASC LIMITED Burton Latimer Kettering Northamptonshire NN15 5JP / GB | [1985/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hyde, Roger John 155 London Road Kettering Northamptonshire / GB | [1985/22] | Representative(s) | Weston, Robert Dale, et al PHILLIPS & LEIGH 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/22] | Weston, Robert Dale, et al c/o PHILLIPS & LEIGH 7 Staple Inn High Holborn London WC1V 7QF / GB | Application number, filing date | 84307773.6 | 09.11.1984 | [1985/22] | Priority number, date | GB19830030601 | 16.11.1983 Original published format: GB 8330601 | GB19840009965 | 17.04.1984 Original published format: GB 8409965 | [1985/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0142966 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0142966 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/08, B65D25/38 | [1985/22] | CPC: |
B67D1/0832 (EP);
B67D1/0847 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/22] | Title | German: | Ventilverschluss für kleine Tonnen oder Fässer | [1985/22] | English: | Valved closure for kegs or casks | [1985/22] | French: | Fermeture à soupape pour tonnelets ou fûts | [1985/22] | Examination procedure | 31.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/03] | 07.05.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 13.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.01.1988 | CH | 13.01.1988 | LI | 13.01.1988 | SE | 31.01.1988 | [1989/26] |
Former [1989/21] | AT | 13.01.1988 | |
SE | 31.01.1988 | ||
Former [1989/13] | AT | 13.01.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | GB1214953 [ ] (GASKELL & CHAMBERS LTD); | DE1775676 [ ] (BALTZER WALTER) | Examination | EP0089727 | EP0102701 |