EP0142971 - Capacitor and method of packaging it [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 04.09.1998 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.2015 | Change - lapse in a contracting state State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI | published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 8501 West Higgins Road Chicago Illinois 60631-2887 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/22] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 8501 West Higgins Road Chicago, Illinois 60631-2887 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rayburn, Charles C. 1920 Burnt Bridge Road Apt. 221 Lynchburg Virginia 24503 / US | [1985/22] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/22] | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 84307790.0 | 12.11.1984 | [1985/22] | Priority number, date | US19830552891 | 17.11.1983 Original published format: US 552891 | [1985/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0142971 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0142971 | Date: | 20.11.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0142971 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.10.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H01G1/10, H01G1/147, H01G13/00 | [1986/44] | CPC: |
H01G4/232 (EP,US);
B23K11/20 (EP,US);
H01G13/006 (EP,US);
H01G4/224 (EP,US);
H01G4/228 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1985/22] | H01G1/10, H01G1/14, H01G1/147 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1985/22] | Title | German: | Kondensator und sein Verpackungsverfahren | [1985/31] | English: | Capacitor and method of packaging it | [1985/22] | French: | Condensateur et procédé pour l'envelopper | [1985/31] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1992/33: Teilanmeldung 89119905.1 eingereicht am 12/11/84 | EPB 1992/33: Divisional application 89119905.1 filed on 12/11/84 | EPB 1992/33: Demande divisionnaire 89119905.1 déposée le 12/11/84 | Examination procedure | 11.05.1987 | Examination requested [1987/28] | 19.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.06.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1990 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 10.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP89119905.1 / EP0355870 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.05.1993
12.11.1993
ADMISSIBLE Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/29] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.05.1993
12.11.1993
ADMISSIBLE Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 D-80506 München / DE | 19.11.1993 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.03.1994 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.03.1995 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.05.1995 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 03.07.1998 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1998/43] | 14.08.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 04.07.1995 | Appeal received No. T0554/95 | 11.09.1995 | Statement of grounds filed | 03.07.1998 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 03.07.1998 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.07.1998 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Request for further processing for: | 04.01.1991 | Request for further processing filed | 07.12.1990 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.01.1991 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.10.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2015/21] |
Former [2000/52] | CH | 12.08.1992 | |
LI | 12.08.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2011717 (SIEMENS AG); | [A]FR2258761 (MATERIEL TELEPHONIQUE [FR]); | [A]GB880169 ; | [A]FR2243511 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]); | [A]US3965552 (RUTT TRUMAN C); | [A]US2921246 (PECK DAVID B, et al); | [A]GB826286 (TELEPHONE MFG CO LTD); | [A]US3067488 (BENNETT MORELAND P, et al); | [A]DE300216 |