Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |
28.01.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.03.1988 [1988/11] |
02.12.1986 | Publication of search report | published on 21.01.1987 [1987/04] |
14.10.1986 | Change - applicant | published on 03.12.1986 [1986/49] |
21.04.1986 | Change - applicant | published on 11.06.1986 [1986/24] |
24.05.1985 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.07.1985 [1985/30] |