EP0149317 - Circuit packaging [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STC PLC 10, Maltravers Street London, WC2R 3HA / GB | [1986/49] |
Former [1986/24] | For all designated states STC PLC 190 Strand London, WC2R 1DU / GB | ||
Former [1985/30] | For all designated states STANDARD TELEPHONES AND CABLES PUBLIC LIMITED COMPANY 190 Strand London, WC2R 1DU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heeks, John Stuart 6, Staffords Churchgate Street Harlow Essex / GB | 02 /
Mun, Joseph 204A Old Road Harlow Essex / GB | 03 /
Plumb, Richard Gordon 2, Elmwood Sawbridgeworth Herts. / GB | [1985/30] | Representative(s) | Dennis, Mark Charles Nortel Networks Intellectual Property Law Group London Road Harlow Essex CM17 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/30] | Dennis, Mark Charles Nortel Limited Patents and Licensing West Road Harlow Essex CM20 2SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 84307928.6 | 15.11.1984 | [1985/30] | Priority number, date | GB19840000954 | 13.01.1984 Original published format: GB 8400954 | [1985/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0149317 | Date: | 24.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0149317 | Date: | 21.01.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1986 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/28, H05K3/46 | [1985/30] | CPC: |
H01L31/0203 (EP);
H01L23/5383 (EP);
H01L23/5389 (EP);
H01L24/24 (EP);
H01L24/82 (EP);
H01L25/16 (EP);
H01L2224/24227 (EP);
H01L2924/01014 (EP);
H01L2924/01049 (EP);
H01L2924/10329 (EP);
H01L2924/12043 (EP);
H01L2924/13063 (EP);
H01L2924/14 (EP);
H01L2924/15153 (EP);
H01L2924/1517 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/24227, H01L2924/1517 (EP);
H01L2924/12043, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2924/1517, H01L2924/15153 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/30] | Title | German: | Das Umhüllen gedruckter Leiterzüge | [1985/30] | English: | Circuit packaging | [1985/30] | French: | Recouvrement de circuits imprimés | [1985/30] | File destroyed: | 08.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 22.07.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/11] | 20.10.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1988/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.07.1987 | M02   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0072759 ; | [X]DE2415187 ; | [X]GB2000909 ; | [A]EP0078194 |