EP0147103 - Mos implementation of shift register latch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.10.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.12.1992 [1992/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Texas Instruments Incorporated 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas, Texas 75265 / US | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation New Orchard Road Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1985/27] | For all designated states TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INCORPORATED 13500 North Central Expressway Dallas Texas 75265 / US | ||
For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Old Orchard Road Armonk, N.Y. 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tubbs, Graham S. 2311 Trailwood Lane Richmond Texas / US | 02 /
Daniels, Martin D. 11011 Longcommon Houston Texas / US | 03 /
Schaaf, Robert 7436 Timberwall Road Saugerties New York 12477 / US | 04 /
Walther, Ron 7800 Northcrest Blvd, Apt. 405 Austin Texas 78752 / US | [1985/27] | Representative(s) | Abbott, David John, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/27] | Abbott, David John, et al Abel & Imray Northumberland House 303-306 High Holborn London, WC1V 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 84308458.3 | 05.12.1984 | [1985/27] | Priority number, date | US19830557783 | 05.12.1983 Original published format: US 557783 | [1985/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0147103 | Date: | 03.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0147103 | Date: | 30.03.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0147103 | Date: | 18.12.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G11C19/28 | [1985/27] | CPC: |
G11C19/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1985/27] | Title | German: | MOS-Durchführung eines Schieberegisterverrieglers | [1985/27] | English: | Mos implementation of shift register latch | [1985/27] | French: | Réalisation MOS d'une bascule de registre à décalage | [1985/27] | Examination procedure | 12.09.1988 | Examination requested [1988/45] | 30.03.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.10.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 06.06.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 17.06.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.01.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2371824 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO [JP]); | [A]US4181861 (MAEHASHI YUKIO [JP]); | [A]GB2050018 (HITACHI LTD) | [A] - G. LUECKE et al.: "Semiconductor memory design and application", 1973, pages 63-66, edited by R.E. Sawyer, McGraw-Hill Book Co., New York, US |