Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.1991 [1991/26] |
19.05.1990 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.07.1990 [1990/27] |
21.07.1989 | First examination report | |
16.05.1988 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.07.1988 [1988/27] |
07.04.1988 | Publication of search report | published on 25.05.1988 [1988/21] |
31.05.1985 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 31.07.1985 [1985/31] |