Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU567390B | Global Dossier | 19.11.1987 | B2 | AU3802985 | 01.08.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8401804 | 24.01.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0149900 | Global Dossier | 04.07.1990 | B1 | EP0149900 | 25.05.1988 | A3 | EP0149900 | 31.07.1985 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB8401804 | 24.01.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3482654D1 | 09.08.1990 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB8401804 | 24.01.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB8401804D0 | 29.02.1984 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB8401804 | 24.01.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IE56294 | 05.06.1991 | B1 | IE850043L | 24.07.1985 | L | Priority number | Date | GB8401804 | 24.01.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPS60160457 | 22.08.1985 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8401804 | 24.01.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4688188 | 18.08.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | GB8401804 | 24.01.1984 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA85150 | 28.08.1985 | B | Priority number | Date | GB8401804 | 24.01.1984 |