EP0149900 - Data storage apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1991 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.06.1991 [1991/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL COMPUTERS LIMITED ICL House Putney, London, SW15 1SW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/31] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL COMPUTERS LIMITED ICL House Putney, London, SW15 1SW / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Washington, Ivan Goddard 9 Newstead Close Poynton Stockport Cheshire SK12 1ES / GB | [1985/31] | Representative(s) | Guyatt, Derek Charles, et al International Computers Limited Intellectual Property Department Cavendish Road Stevenage, Herts, SG1 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/31] | Guyatt, Derek Charles, et al Intellectual Property Department International Computers Limited Cavendish Road Stevenage, Herts, SG1 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 84308562.2 | 10.12.1984 | [1985/31] | Priority number, date | GB19840001804 | 24.01.1984 Original published format: GB 8401804 | [1985/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0149900 | Date: | 31.07.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0149900 | Date: | 25.05.1988 | Language: | EN | [1988/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0149900 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/16 | [1985/31] | CPC: |
G06F13/1626 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1985/31] | Title | German: | Datenspeichergerät | [1985/31] | English: | Data storage apparatus | [1985/31] | French: | Appareil de mémorisation de données | [1985/31] | Examination procedure | 25.04.1988 | Examination requested [1988/27] | 24.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.08.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.01.1990 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4183058 (TAYLOR RICHARD J [GB]); | [Y]EP0032863 (CII HONEYWELL BULL [FR]); | [A]US4287558 (NISHITANI TAKAO); | [Y]US4317168 (MESSINA BENEDICTO U, et al) | [A] - E.D.N. ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWS, vol. 28, no. 4, 17th February 1983, pages 231-242, Boston, Massachusetts, US; D. WOOTEN: "Nibble-mode technique simplifies complex RAM designs" |