EP0146374 - Process for the preparation of vicinal diols soluble in water [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1991 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.04.1991 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 12.06.1991 [1991/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Montedison S.p.A. 31, Foro Buonaparte I-20121 Milan / IT | [1985/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Venturello, Carlo 135, Via XXIII Marzo I-Novara / IT | 02 /
Gambaro, Mario 5, Via Borrini I-28067 Pernate Novara / IT | [1985/26] | Representative(s) | Whalley, Kevin, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1985/26] | Whalley, Kevin, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 84308775.0 | 14.12.1984 | [1985/26] | Priority number, date | IT19830024203 | 16.12.1983 Original published format: IT 2420383 | [1985/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0146374 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | EN | [1985/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0146374 | Date: | 16.07.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0146374 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1986 | Classification | IPC: | C07C29/03, C07C31/20, C07C35/20, C07C35/14, C07C35/06, C07C33/26 | [1985/26] | CPC: |
C07C29/03 (EP,US);
C07B2200/09 (EP,US);
C07C2601/08 (EP,US);
C07C2601/14 (EP,US);
C07C2601/18 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C07C29/03, C07C31/20 (EP,US);
C07C29/03, C07C31/205 (US,EP);
C07C29/03, C07C31/42 (EP,US);
C07C29/03, C07C33/26 (US,EP);
C07C29/03, C07C33/46 (US,EP);
C07C29/03, C07C35/06 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1985/26] | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren von vicinalen, im Wasser löslichen Diolen | [1985/31] | English: | Process for the preparation of vicinal diols soluble in water | [1985/26] | French: | Procédé de préparation de diols vicinaux solubles dans l'eau | [1985/31] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 01.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/03] | 28.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.12.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.12.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 13.06.1990 | [1991/24] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3156709 (GRAHAM ALLAN GEORGE); | [Y]GB2055821 (DONEGANI GUIDO IST); | [YPD]EP0109273 (MONTEDISON SPA [IT]) |