EP0125151 - Graphics printer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.1989 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER INDUSTRIES 50, avenue Jean-Jaurès B.P. 620-05 F-92542 Montrouge Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1988/16] | For all designated states SCHLUMBERGER INDUSTRIES 50, avenue Jean-Jaurès B.P. 620-05 F-92542 Montrouge Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1984/46] | For all designated states BENSON Société anonyme dite: Z.I. des petites haies 1, rue Jean Lemoine F-94015 Creteil / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dard, Jean-Claude 29, rue des Glycines F-93250 Villemomble / FR | 02 /
Le Tuan, Phac 1, Allée du Grippet F-94470 Boissy-Saint-Leger / FR | 03 /
Roche, Michel 34, Route Cossée F-77181 Courtry / FR | [1984/46] | Representative(s) | Chareyron, Lucien Service Brevets Patent Department Etudes et Productions Schlumberger BP 202 92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/35] | Chareyron, Lucien Service Brevets Patent Department Etudes et Productions Schlumberger BP 202 F-92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1988/22] | Chareyron, Lucien Service Brevets Patent Department Etudes et Productions Schlumberger BP 202 F-92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1988/16] | (deleted) | ||
Former [1985/04] | Chareyron, Lucien, et al Service Brevets Patent Department Etudes et Productions Schlumberger BP 202 F-92142 Clamart Cédex / FR | ||
Former [1984/46] | Chareyron, Lucien Schlumberger Limited Service Brevets c/o Giers, B.P. 121 12, place des Etats-Unis F-92124 Montrouge Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 84400252.7 | 07.02.1984 | [1984/46] | Priority number, date | FR19830002060 | 09.02.1983 Original published format: FR 8302060 | [1984/46] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0125151 | Date: | 14.11.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0125151 | Date: | 27.07.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1988 | Classification | IPC: | G01D9/40, G01D9/28 | [1988/23] | CPC: |
G01D9/285 (EP);
G01D9/08 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1984/46] | G01D9/40 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/46] | Title | German: | Zeichnungsapparat | [1984/46] | English: | Graphics printer | [1984/46] | French: | Machine graphique | [1984/46] | File destroyed: | 11.05.1995 | Examination procedure | 28.01.1989 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1989/43] | 05.06.1989 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1989/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.02.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 10.04.1989 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.1989 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2072339 ; | [X]US3949408 ; | [X]US3975742 ; | [A]US3974506 |