Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
10.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.1988 [1988/52] |
21.11.1987 | (Expected) grant | published on 07.01.1988 [1988/01] |
05.02.1985 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.04.1985 [1985/15] |
07.07.1984 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.09.1984 [1984/36] |