EP0117805 - Modular heat exchanger and process for its manufacture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.11.1988 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.11.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.12.1988 [1988/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Institut Français du Pétrole 4, Avenue de Bois Préau 92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/36] | For all designated states INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE 4, Avenue de Bois Préau F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Grehier, Alain 26, rue Mousset Robert F-75012 Paris / FR | 02 /
Rojey, Alexander 29-33, rue Henri Régnault F-92380 Garches / FR | 03 /
Benoist, François 20, rue de la Fraternité F-92700 Colombes / FR | [1984/36] | Application number, filing date | 84400301.2 | 15.02.1984 | [1984/36] | Priority number, date | FR19830002740 | 17.02.1983 Original published format: FR 8302740 | [1984/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0117805 | Date: | 05.09.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0117805 | Date: | 07.01.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.1984 | Classification | IPC: | F28F3/08, F28F21/06 | [1984/36] | CPC: |
F28F21/065 (EP,US);
F28F3/086 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4935 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT, NL [1984/36] | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher in Modulbauweise und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1984/36] | English: | Modular heat exchanger and process for its manufacture | [1984/36] | French: | Echangeur de chaleur à structure modulaire et son procédé de fabrication | [1984/36] | Examination procedure | 25.01.1985 | Examination requested [1985/15] | 10.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.03.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/52] | Request for further processing for: | 03.07.1986 | Request for further processing filed | 03.07.1986 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 28.07.1986 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1985 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2093582 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE); | [A]FR2362354 (PRONKO VLADIMIR [SU]); | [A]EP0039291 (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR], et al); | [A]US2537276 (MCMAHON HOWARD O, et al); | [A]FR2455721 (INST FRANCAIS DU PETROLE); | [A]FR2103583 (ICI LTD); | [A]US4359181 (CHISHOLM JOHN) |