EP0119912 - Macromolecular material constituted by a salt in solution in a copolymer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.1991 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.06.1991 [1991/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE ELF AQUITAINE Tour Aquitaine 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | For all designated states SOCIETE NATIONALE ELF AQUITAINE Tour Aquitaine F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Armand, Michel Domaine Jean Jaurès Allée Maurice Ravel F-38130 Echirolles / FR | 02 /
Muller, Daniel 12 Rue Frédéric Mistral F-64000 Pau / FR | 03 /
Duval Michel 4993 Jean Brillant Montreal H3W IT8 / CA | 04 /
Harvey, Paul-Etienne 2385 Bellerose, app. 402 Longueuil - QC J4L 4H8 / CA | [1984/39] | Representative(s) | Ohresser, François Elf Aquitaine Division Proprieté Industrielle Tour Elf 92078 Paris La Défense Cédex 45 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/39] | Ohresser, François Elf Aquitaine Division Proprieté Industrielle Tour Elf F-92078 Paris La Défense Cédex 45 / FR | Application number, filing date | 84400480.4 | 09.03.1984 | [1984/39] | Priority number, date | ID19920000028 | 11.03.1983 Original published format: ID 9228 | FR19830009886 | 15.06.1983 Original published format: FR 8309886 | [1984/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0119912 | Date: | 26.09.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0119912 | Date: | 02.10.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0119912 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01B1/12, H01M6/18, H01M4/60, C08L71/02 | [1984/39] | CPC: |
C08L71/02 (EP,US);
C08G65/04 (EP,US);
H01B1/122 (EP,US);
H01M6/181 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/39] | Title | German: | Makromolekuläres Material bestehend aus einem in einem Kopolymer gelösten Salz | [1984/39] | English: | Macromolecular material constituted by a salt in solution in a copolymer | [1984/39] | French: | Matériau macromoléculaire constitué par un sel en solution dans un copolymère | [1984/39] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1984 | Examination requested [1984/39] | 29.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.11.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 12.12.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.02.1990 | Fee for grant paid | 12.02.1990 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.03.1991 | No opposition filed within time limit [1991/23] | Request for further processing for: | 04.08.1986 | Request for further processing filed | 05.08.1986 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.08.1985 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.03.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3298980 (LUNDBERG ROBERT D, et al); | [A]US3380957 (ELMER OTTO C, et al); | [A]US4281072 (WETTON RAYMOND E, et al); | [X]EP0037776 (FRANCE ETAT [FR]); | [XP]EP0090710 (ANVAR [FR], et al); | [XP]DE3317761 (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]) | [A] - EXTENDED ABSTRACTS, vol. 81-2, octobre 1981, pages 1485-1489, abrégé no. 615, Pennington, New Jersey, US; M. ARMAND: "The solvent-free elecrolytes: relationship between conductivity and polymer structure" | [AP] - SOLID STATE IONICS, vol. 9/10, partie 2, décembre 1983, pages 745-754, North-Holland Publishing Co., Amsterdam, NL; M. ARMAND: "Polymer solid electrolytes - an overview" | [A] - JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, vol. 102, 1980, pages 7981-7982, American Chemical Society, US; W.J. SCHULTZ et al.: "A new family of cation-binding compounds: threo-alpha,upsilon-poly(cyclooxalkane)diyl" |