EP0121474 - Safety apparatus for surgical occluding and cutting device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.06.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.08.1990 [1990/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk Connecticut 06856 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1984/41] | For all designated states United States Surgical Corporation 150 Glover Avenue Norwalk, Connecticut 06856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Poirier, James W. 327 Fairview Avenue Bridgeport Connecticut 06606 / US | [1984/41] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/03] | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1984/41] | Corre, Jacques Denis Paul Cabinet Regimbeau 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 84400635.3 | 29.03.1984 | [1984/41] | Priority number, date | US19830480532 | 30.03.1983 Original published format: US 480532 | US19840570186 | 12.01.1984 Original published format: US 570186 | [1984/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0121474 | Date: | 10.10.1984 | Language: | EN | [1984/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0121474 | Date: | 05.03.1986 | Language: | EN | [1986/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0121474 | Date: | 23.08.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1986 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12 | [1984/41] | CPC: |
A61B17/122 (EP,US);
A61B17/128 (EP,US);
A61B17/32 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00022 (EP,US);
A61B2017/1225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, FR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/41] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsvorrichtung für ein Gerät zur chirurgischen Abschliessung und zum Schneiden | [1984/41] | English: | Safety apparatus for surgical occluding and cutting device | [1984/41] | French: | Dispositif pour l'occlusion chirurgicale et pour couper muni d'un appareil de sécurité | [1984/41] | Examination procedure | 18.07.1986 | Examination requested [1986/38] | 18.01.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.07.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CH | 23.08.1989 | LI | 23.08.1989 | SE | 23.08.1989 | [1990/19] |
Former [1990/17] | CH | 23.08.1989 | |
LI | 23.08.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | US4026294 [ ] (MATTLER MARTIN); | DE2546696 [ ]; | US4086926 [ ] (GREEN DAVID THOMAS, et al); | US4207898 [ ] (BECHT CARL T [US]); | US4349028 [ ] (GREEN DAVID T) |