EP0122859 - Sealing piece to join linear sealing trimmings together [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 20.06.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.1990 | Opposition rejected | published on 08.08.1990 [1990/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DÄTWYLER FRANCE 69, Rue Nationale Estrees F-02420 Bellicourt / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/43] | For all designated states DÄTWYLER FRANCE 69, Rue Nationale Estrees F-02420 Bellicourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aubert, Charles 7, Rue Tahere F-92210 Saint-Cloud / FR | [1984/43] | Representative(s) | Laget, Jean-Loup, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/43] | Laget, Jean-Loup, et al Cabinet Pierre Loyer 77, rue Boissière F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 84400735.1 | 12.04.1984 | [1984/43] | Priority number, date | FR19830006018 | 13.04.1983 Original published format: FR 8306018 | [1984/43] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0122859 | Date: | 24.10.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0122859 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0122859 | Date: | 13.01.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | E04D3/38, E04F19/02, E04F19/06, E04B1/68, E04B2/88, F17C3/02 | [1984/43] | CPC: |
E04D3/38 (EP);
E04B2/88 (EP);
E04F19/06 (EP);
F17C3/027 (EP);
F17C2270/0107 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, LI, NL [1984/43] | Title | German: | Abdichtungsstück, um linienförmige Abdichtungsbeläge zu verbinden | [1984/43] | English: | Sealing piece to join linear sealing trimmings together | [1984/43] | French: | Pièce d'étanchéité pour la jonction de garnitures d'étanchéité linéaires | [1984/43] | Examination procedure | 31.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/17] | 03.10.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.02.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.07.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.10.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 05.10.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
13.10.1988
08.11.1988
ADMISSIBLE Semperit AG Holding Modecenterstrasse 22 1031 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Müller, Hans-Jürgen Müller Schupfner & Partner Patentanwälte Bavariaring 11 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1988/49] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
13.10.1988
08.11.1988
ADMISSIBLE Semperit AG Holding Modecenterstr. 22 A-1031 Wien / AT Opponent's representative Müller, Hans-Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Postfach 10 11 61 D-80085 München / DE | 07.12.1988 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.06.1989 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 22.06.1989 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 07.02.1990 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 17.02.1990 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1990/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3091817 ; | [Y]FR1230506 ; | [Y]DE1903881 ; | [A]FR1370087 |