EP0127522 - Rain and spray water tight pressure equalising device, particularly for transport containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.05.1990 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 27.06.1990 [1990/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE Société Nationale Industrielle 37, Boulevard de Montmorency 75781 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/45] | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE Société Nationale Industrielle 37, Boulevard de Montmorency F-75781 Paris Cédex 16 / FR | ||
Former [1984/49] | For all designated states AEROSPATIALE SOCIETE NATIONALE INDUSTRIELLE 37 boulevard de Montmorency F-75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chaussepied, Jacques Emile Charles 37 rue Gabriel Durand F-33160 Saint Medard en Jailles / FR | [1984/49] | Representative(s) | Barnay, André François Cabinet Barnay 72, rue d'Hauteville B.P. 171 75463 Paris Cédex 10 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/49] | Barnay, André François Cabinet Barnay 72, rue d'Hauteville B.P. 171 F-75463 Paris Cédex 10 / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401002.5 | 16.05.1984 | [1984/49] | Priority number, date | FR19830008364 | 20.05.1983 Original published format: FR 8308364 | [1984/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0127522 | Date: | 05.12.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0127522 | Date: | 19.03.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.1984 | Classification | IPC: | B65D90/34 | [1984/49] | CPC: |
B65D90/34 (EP,US);
Y10S220/27 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1984/49] | Title | German: | Regen- und Spritzwassersichere Vorrichtung zum Druckausgleich, insbesondere für Transportbehälter | [1984/49] | English: | Rain and spray water tight pressure equalising device, particularly for transport containers | [1984/49] | French: | Dispositif d'équilibrage de pression étanche aux eaux de pluie ou de ruissellement, notamment pour conteneur de transport | [1984/49] | Examination procedure | 18.05.1984 | Examination requested [1984/49] | 14.08.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 16.09.1985 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.11.1985 | Fee for grant paid | 22.11.1985 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.12.1986 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/11] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]FR2369175 (GRAAFF KG [DE]); | [AD]FR2436718 (GRAAFF KG [DE]); | [A]GB2068900 (ADAMSON CONTAINERS LTD); | [A]EP0040993 (SEA CONTAINERS LTD [GB]); | [A]GB2087538 (FRUEHAUF CRANE LTD); | [A]EP0077267 (VENISSIEUX ATEL [FR], et al) |