EP0126695 - Composite multi-layered enveloping or panelling structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.1989 [1989/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNION SIDERURGIQUE DU NORD ET DE L'EST DE LA FRANCE par abréviation "USINOR" La Défense 9, 4, place de la Pyramide 92800 Puteaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/48] | For all designated states UNION SIDERURGIQUE DU NORD ET DE L'EST DE LA FRANCE par abréviation "USINOR" La Défense 9, 4, place de la Pyramide F-92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
de Smet, Gabriel 9 Rue Kielford 92100 Courbevoie / FR | [1984/48] | Representative(s) | Moncheny, Michel, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/48] | Moncheny, Michel, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix 2 Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401046.2 | 18.05.1984 | [1984/48] | Priority number, date | FR19830008313 | 19.05.1983 Original published format: FR 8308313 | [1984/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0126695 | Date: | 28.11.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0126695 | Date: | 16.10.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0126695 | Date: | 03.08.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F16M1/08 | [1984/48] | CPC: |
F16M1/08 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12347 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12361 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12653 (EP,US);
Y10T74/2186 (EP,US);
Y10T74/219 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1984/48] | Title | German: | Gehäuse oder Plattenaufbau zusammengesetzt aus mehreren Schichten | [1984/48] | English: | Composite multi-layered enveloping or panelling structure | [1984/48] | French: | Structure d'enveloppe ou de panneau composite multicouches | [1984/48] | Examination procedure | 19.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/17] | 30.04.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 29.01.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.04.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 23.04.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.05.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP57131844 ; | [A]US1902934 (ACKER GEORGE H); | [A]FR872857 (DEUTSCHE EISENWERKE AG); | [A]DE740214 (AUDI AG); | [A]GB599506 (WILLIAM LEWIS DAVIES, et al); | [A]DE869576 (SKF SVENSKA KULLAGERFAB AB); | [A]DE1961014 (SKF SVENSKA KULLAGERFAB AB); | [A]FR2088615 (NEGRE GUY); | [A]US3685773 (OTTO CHARLES W); | [A]US3721597 (COLBURN L); | [A]US3750267 (OTTO C); | [A]US4022648 (WOODBERRY PAUL T, et al); | [A]DE2801140 (LEISTRITZ HANS KARL); | [A]DE2905826 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [A]DE3010689 (BRUNN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 232 (M-172)[1110], 18 novembre 1982; & JP-A-57 131 844 (TOYOTA JIDOSHA KOGYO K.K.) 14-08-1982, & JP57131844 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0080083 |