EP0162988 - Hydrokinetic injector, particularly for balneotherapeutic applications [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.1990 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU State(s) deleted from list of lapses: BE | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dodier, Jacques 20, Allée Simone Weil F-35100 Rennes / FR | [1985/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/49] | Representative(s) | Ahner, Francis, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/49] | Ahner, Francis, et al CABINET REGIMBEAU 26, avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401102.3 | 29.05.1984 | [1985/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0162988 | Date: | 04.12.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0162988 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A61H9/00 | [1985/49] | CPC: |
B05B1/044 (EP);
B05B1/34 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/49] | Title | German: | Hydrokinetische Injektionsdüse, insbesondere für die Balneotherapie | [1985/49] | English: | Hydrokinetic injector, particularly for balneotherapeutic applications | [1985/49] | French: | Injecteur hydrocinétique en particulier pour applications balnéothérapiques | [1985/49] | Examination procedure | 01.04.1986 | Examination requested [1986/23] | 06.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.03.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.04.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.06.1987 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.1987 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.05.1989 | [1999/52] |
Former [1989/39] | BE | 31.05.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3892363 (HILGER RONALD O); | [A]US4135670 (SUGIMOTO YOSHIO); | [A]FR2497123 (DODIER JACQUES [FR]) |