EP0128092 - Tritium breeding solid blanket for a deuterium-tritium fusion reactor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.04.1989 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.1997 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 23.04.1997 [1997/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Fiat 1 place de la Coupole F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1986/16] | For all designated states FRAMATOME Tour Fiat 1 place de la Coupole F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
Former [1984/50] | For all designated states FRAMATOME ET CIE. Tour Fiat 1, Place de la Coupole F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chevereau, Gérard 84, Avenue Thiers F-93340 Le Raincy / FR | [1984/50] | Representative(s) | des Termes, Monique, et al Société Brevatome 3, rue du Docteur Lancereaux 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/50] | Des Termes, Monique, et al Société Brevatome 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401118.9 | 30.05.1984 | [1984/50] | Priority number, date | FR19830009258 | 03.06.1983 Original published format: FR 8309258 | [1984/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0128092 | Date: | 12.12.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0128092 | Date: | 18.05.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.09.1984 | Classification | IPC: | G21B1/00 | [1984/50] | CPC: |
G21B1/00 (EP);
Y02E30/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1984/50] | Title | German: | Tritium brütendes Fest-Blanket eines Deuterium-Tritium-Fusionreaktors | [1984/50] | English: | Tritium breeding solid blanket for a deuterium-tritium fusion reactor | [1984/50] | French: | Dispositif de couverture de réacteur à fusion nucléaire utilisant la réaction deutérium tritium, à matériau tritigène solide | [1984/50] | Examination procedure | 04.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/33] | 22.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.11.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.12.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 17.12.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1164280 | [A] - ATOMKERNENERGIE, vol. 32, no. 3, 1978, Munich (DE)M.M.H. RAGHEB et al.: "Three-dimensional cell calculations for a fusion reactor gas-cooled solid blanket", pages 159-168 | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE 9TH SYMPOSIUM ON ENGINEERING PROBLEMS OF FUSION RESEARCH, vol. 1, Chicago, Ill., 26-29 octobre 1981, New York (US) G.D. MORGAN et al.:"Conceptual design of tritium breeding blanket for INTOR", pages 732-735 | [A] - FUSION TECHNOLOGY, PROCEEDINGS OF THE 10TH SYMPOSIUM, vol. 2, Padova (IT), 4-9 septembre 1978, L.J. BAKER:"Some implications of a cellular structure in minimum thickness fusion reactor blankets", pages 661-666 |