EP0129464 - Wide band radio frequency impedance transformer with a transformation ratio of about three [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.11.1987 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1987 [1987/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON-CSF 173, Boulevard Haussmann F-75008 Paris / FR | [1984/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baer, Jean-Michel THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1984/52] | Representative(s) | Courtellemont, Alain, et al Thomson-CSF Propriété Intellectuelle, 13, Avenue du Président Salvador Allende 94117 Arcueil Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/52] | Courtellemont, Alain, et al THOMSON-CSF, SCPI, B.P. 329, 50, rue Jean-Pierre Timbaud F-92402 Courbevoie Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401170.0 | 06.06.1984 | [1984/52] | Priority number, date | FR19830010064 | 17.06.1983 Original published format: FR 8310064 | [1984/52] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0129464 | Date: | 27.12.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0129464 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | H03H7/38, H01F19/04 | [1984/52] | CPC: |
H01F19/04 (EP,US);
H03H7/38 (EP,US);
H01F2027/2833 (EP,US);
H01F2038/143 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1984/52] | Title | German: | Breitband-Hochfrequenz-Impedanz-Transformator mit Transformationsverhältnis von ungefähr drei | [1984/52] | English: | Wide band radio frequency impedance transformer with a transformation ratio of about three | [1984/52] | French: | Transformateur d'impédance, à large bande, de rapport de transformation voisin de trois, pour radiofréquences | [1984/52] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 02.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/29] | 27.02.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 20.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.08.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 07.08.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1231183 (THOMSON HOUSTON COMP FRANCAISE); | [A]US3370257 (SPIERLING HERBERT C); | [A]US4222016 (STOCK DON J R, et al) |