EP0132427 - Rotor of a small electric motor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.11.1987 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.11.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1987 [1987/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DUCELLIER & Cie Echat 950 F-94024 Créteil Cedex / FR | [1985/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Savelli, Francis 8 rue des Pavillons Fleuris F-94500 Champigny / FR | [1985/05] | Representative(s) | Habert, Roger VALEO Service Propriété Industrielle 21 rue Auguste Blanqui F-93406 Saint-Ouen / FR | [1985/05] | Application number, filing date | 84401288.0 | 21.06.1984 | [1985/05] | Priority number, date | FR19830012054 | 21.07.1983 Original published format: FR 8312054 | [1985/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0132427 | Date: | 30.01.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0132427 | Date: | 06.03.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0132427 | Date: | 07.01.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.01.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H02K3/51, H02K7/116 | [1985/05] | CPC: |
H02K3/51 (EP,US);
H02K7/1166 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [1985/05] | Title | German: | Läufer eines elektrischen Kleinmotors | [1985/05] | English: | Rotor of a small electric motor | [1985/05] | French: | Rotor de petit moteur électrique | [1985/05] | Examination procedure | 25.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/38] | 07.03.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.06.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.10.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5785563 ; | [A]US2315300 (HENRY VAILLANT); | [A]FR1600829 ; | [A]FR2449354 (RAU SWF AUTOZUBEHOER [DE]); | [A]FR2396149 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 170(E-128)(1048), 3 septembre 1982; & JP - A - 57 85563 (RICOH K.K.) 28-05-1982, & JP5785563 A 00000000 |