Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0130892 | Global Dossier | 01.07.1987 | B1 | EP0130892 | 09.01.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8310573 | 27.06.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA1222656 | 09.06.1987 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8310573 | 27.06.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3464521D1 | 06.08.1987 | D1 | Priority number | Date | FR8310573 | 27.06.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES8506162 | 01.07.1985 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8310573 | 27.06.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2547911 | 13.12.1985 | B1 | FR2547911 | 28.12.1984 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR8310573 | 27.06.1983 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US4580499 | 08.04.1986 | A | Priority number | Date | FR8310573 | 27.06.1983 |