EP0132179 - Operating table [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/04] | Device providing several adjustment possibilities such as into a surgical operation table | ||
[1988/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.1989 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.04.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.05.1989 [1989/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALM 63 rue de Paris 93310 Le-Pre-Saint-Gervais / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/04] | For all designated states A L M 63 rue de Paris F-93310 Le-Pre-Saint-Gervais / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hubert, Jean 67, avenue Parmentier F-75011 Paris / FR | [1985/04] | Representative(s) | Jacobson, Claude, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/17] | Jacobson, Claude, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves F-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [1985/04] | Leclercq, Maurice L'AIR LIQUIDE SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401326.8 | 25.06.1984 | [1985/04] | Priority number, date | FR19830010828 | 30.06.1983 Original published format: FR 8310828 | [1985/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0132179 | Date: | 23.01.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0132179 | Date: | 08.06.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | A61G13/00 | [1985/04] | CPC: |
A61G13/02 (EP,US);
A61G13/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/04] | Title | German: | Operationstisch | [1988/23] | English: | Operating table | [1988/23] | French: | Table d'opération chirurgicale | [1988/23] |
Former [1985/04] | Vorrichtung mit mehreren Einstellmöglichkeiten wie ein chirurgischer Operationstisch | ||
Former [1985/04] | Device providing several adjustment possibilities such as into a surgical operation table | ||
Former [1985/04] | Installation à degrés de liberté multiples telle que table d'opération chirurgicale | Examination procedure | 28.06.1984 | Examination requested [1985/04] | 03.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.08.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.03.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.05.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2217783 (BELL WILLIAM D); | [A]FR941525 ; | [A]FR1087795 ; | [A]FR1108891 (FLICOTEAUX ETS); | [A]DE2049282 (SURGICAL MECHANICAL RESEARCH I); | [A]DE2260140 (STILLE WERNER AB); | [A]US4101120 (SESHIMA KENSUKE) |