EP0135404 - Process for treating the surface of a transparent layer having anti-tearing properties [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.1990 [1990/13] | Applicant(s) | For:BE
FR
GB
IT
LU
NL
SE
SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE INTERNATIONAL "Les Miroirs" 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | For:DE
VEGLA Vereinigte Glaswerke GmbH Viktoriaallee 3-5 52066 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1985/13] | For:BE
FR
GB
IT
LU
NL
SE
SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE INTERNATIONAL "Les Miroirs" 18, avenue d'Alsace F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
For:DE
VEGLA Vereinigte Glaswerke GmbH Viktoriaallee 3-5 D-52066 Aachen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raedisch, Helmer Nizzaallee 36 D-5100 Aachen / DE | 02 /
Esser, Günther Bardenbergerstrasse 20 D-5120 Herzogenrath / DE | [1985/13] | Representative(s) | Muller, René, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc 93303 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/13] | Muller, René, et al SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc F-93304 Aubervilliers / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401402.7 | 03.07.1984 | [1985/13] | Priority number, date | FR19830011056 | 04.07.1983 Original published format: FR 8311056 | [1985/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0135404 | Date: | 27.03.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0135404 | Date: | 12.04.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | C09G1/12, C09D3/393, C08J7/04 | [1985/13] | CPC: |
C09G1/12 (EP,US);
C08J7/0427 (EP,US);
C08J7/046 (EP,US);
C08J2375/04 (EP,US);
C08J2475/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/257 (EP,US);
Y10T428/258 (EP,US);
Y10T428/259 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31551 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31554 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31598 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1985/13] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Behandlung der Oberfläche von durchsichtigen, schwer zerreissbaren Schichten | [1985/13] | English: | Process for treating the surface of a transparent layer having anti-tearing properties | [1985/13] | French: | Procédé de traitement de la surface d'une couche transparente ayant des propriétés d'antilacération | [1985/13] | Examination procedure | 11.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/47] | 06.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 30.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.12.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.05.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 11.05.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/13] | Request for further processing for: | 11.05.1988 | Request for further processing filed | 11.05.1988 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.07.1988 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB728733 (SIMONIZ CO); | [Y]US3393078 (LOCKHART JOHN W, et al); | [AD]FR2251608 (SAINT GOBAIN [FR], et al); | [YD]US3971864 (BEESTRICE WILLIAM R, et al); | [A]WO8001386 (SEJOURNANT F [FR]) |