EP0136195 - Microbicidal benzamidine derivatives, their preparation and their use in pharmaceutical compositions as disinfection or preservation agents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.04.1988 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SANOFI 54, rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/14] | For all designated states SANOFI 40, Avenue George V F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mosse, Madeleine La Chanterelle Chemin du Réservoir de Montmaur F-34100 Montpellier / FR | 02 /
Demarne, Henri Le Florence Avenue Major Flandre F-34000 Montpellier / FR | 03 /
Filhol, Robert Château d'Alco Bâtiment 7 Rue des Avants-Monts F-34100 Montpellier / FR | [1985/14] | Representative(s) | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/14] | Gillard, Marie-Louise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401494.4 | 13.07.1984 | [1985/14] | Priority number, date | FR19830012824 | 03.08.1983 Original published format: FR 8312824 | [1985/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0136195 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0136195 | Date: | 24.06.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.02.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C07C123/00, A61K31/155, A01N37/52 | [1985/14] | CPC: |
C07C255/00 (EP,US);
C07C257/18 (KR);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07C205/19 (EP,US);
C07C205/37 (EP,US);
C07C33/20 (EP,US);
C07C57/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/14] | Title | German: | Benzamidinderivate mit mikrobizider Wirkung, ihre Herstellungsverfahren und ihre Verwendung in der Pharmazie als Desinfektions- oder Konservierungsmittel | [1985/14] | English: | Microbicidal benzamidine derivatives, their preparation and their use in pharmaceutical compositions as disinfection or preservation agents | [1985/14] | French: | Dérivés de la benzamidine à activité antimicrobienne, procédé d'obtention et application à titre de médicaments désinfectants ou conservateurs | [1985/14] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/46] | 26.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 12.12.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 10.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LU | 31.07.1987 | [1999/52] | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - PHARMAZIE, vol. 30, no. 6, juin 1975, pages 386-389, Berlin, DE; P. WALSMANN et al.: "Synthetische Inhibitoren der Serinproteinasen" | Examination | EP0076430 |