EP0139546 - Process for the production of alcohols by microbial thermophilic fermentation at high concentrations of organic solvents [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.06.1986 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 25-28, rue du Docteur Roux 75724 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/18] | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 25-28, rue du Docteur Roux F-75724 Paris Cédex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zeikus, Joseph Gregory 3229 Knollwood Way Madison Wisconsin 53703 / US | 02 /
Longin, Robert 104 Rue Sadi Carnot F-92170 Vanves / FR | [1985/18] | Representative(s) | Orès, Irène, et al Cabinet ORES 36,rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/18] | Ores, Irène, et al CABINET ORES 6, Avenue de Messine F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401582.6 | 27.07.1984 | [1985/18] | Priority number, date | FR19830012522 | 29.07.1983 Original published format: FR 8312522 | [1985/18] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0139546 | Date: | 02.05.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0139546 | Date: | 12.06.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/28, C12P7/04, C12P7/06, // (C12P7/28, C12R1:145),(C12P7/04, C12R1:145),(C12P7/06, C12R1:145) | [1985/18] | CPC: |
C12P7/04 (EP);
C12P7/065 (EP);
C12P7/28 (EP);
Y02E50/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Alkoholen durch mikrobische thermophilische Gärung bei hoher Konzentration von organischen Lösungsmitteln | [1985/18] | English: | Process for the production of alcohols by microbial thermophilic fermentation at high concentrations of organic solvents | [1985/18] | French: | Procédé de production d'alcools par des fermentations microbiennes thermophiles, à de hautes concentrations de solvants organiques | [1985/18] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | File destroyed: | 15.12.1992 | Examination procedure | 13.02.1986 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1986/33] | 12.03.1986 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1986/33] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR652556 (DEUTSCHE HYDRIERWERKE AG); | [A]US1920735 (STEFAN BAKONYI); | [AP]US4400470 (ZEIKUS JOSEPH G [US], et al) | [X] - PREPRINT - AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, Division of petroleum chemistry, vol. 25, no. 3, 1980, pages 639-649GB; D.I.C. WANG et al.: "Ethanol production by a thermophilic and anaerobic bacterium using xylose" | [X] - EXPERIENTIA, vol. 36, no. 12, 15 décembre 1980, pages 1434-1446, Birkh{user Verlag, BâleCH; J.WIEGEL: "Formation of ethanol by bacteria. A pledge for the use of extreme thermophilic anaerobic bacteria in industrial ethanol fermentation processes" | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 95, no. 5, août 1981, page 581, no. 78449j, Columbus, OhioUS; THOMAS K. NG et al.: "Ethanol production by thermophilic bacteria: fermentation of cellulosic substrates by cocultures of Clostridium thermocellum and Clostridium thermohydrosulfuricum" & APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIO |