EP0136211 - Anti-friction washer for hinges of wings, and device for fitting the washer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.02.1988 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.02.1988 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.03.1988 [1988/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Begouen, Jean-Paul Lombost Archignat F-03380 Huriel / FR | [1985/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/14] | Representative(s) | Chanet, Jacques 56, avenue de Royat B.P. 27 F-63401 Chamalières Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/14] | Chanet, Jacques 56, avenue de Royat B.P. 27 F-63401 Chamalières Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401623.8 | 03.08.1984 | [1985/14] | Priority number, date | FR19830013061 | 04.08.1983 Original published format: FR 8313061 | FR19830019177 | 28.11.1983 Original published format: FR 8319177 | [1985/14] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0136211 | Date: | 03.04.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0136211 | Date: | 24.07.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | E05D11/00 | [1985/14] | CPC: |
F16B43/005 (EP);
E05D11/00 (EP);
E05D7/0027 (EP);
E05Y2600/636 (EP);
E05Y2900/132 (EP);
E05Y2900/148 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, IT, LI [1985/29] |
Former [1985/14] | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Reibungsarme Unterlegscheibe für Flügelscharniere und Vorrichtung zum Unterlegen derselben | [1985/14] | English: | Anti-friction washer for hinges of wings, and device for fitting the washer | [1985/14] | French: | Rondelles antifriction pour charnières d'ouvrants et dispositif de pose de celles-ci | [1985/14] | File destroyed: | 09.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 04.11.1984 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.01.1985 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, GB, LU, NL, SE | 16.01.1986 | Examination requested [1986/20] | 18.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1988/12] | 29.10.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1988/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 03.09.1984 | AT   M02   Not yet paid | 03.09.1984 | BE   M02   Not yet paid | 03.09.1984 | GB   M02   Not yet paid | 03.09.1984 | LU   M02   Not yet paid | 03.09.1984 | NL   M02   Not yet paid | 03.09.1984 | SE   M02   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 24.01.1986 | M02   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1987 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | FR1219725 [ ]; | DE674171 [ ]; | US2989286 [ ] |