EP0143009 - Amphibious vehicle able to serve as a self-contained ferry and able to form a floating bridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.01.1988 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.03.1988 [1988/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHAUDRONNERIE ET FORGES D'ALSACE - C.E.F.A. rue de la Gare 67250 Soultz sous Forets / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/22] | For all designated states CHAUDRONNERIE ET FORGES D'ALSACE - C.E.F.A. rue de la Gare F-67250 Soultz sous Forets / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gillois, Jean 58, rue du Général Galliéni F-78220 Viroflay / FR | [1985/22] | Representative(s) | Maureau, Bernard, et al Cabinet Germain, Maureau et Millet Conseils en Brevets d'Invention 64, rue d'Amsterdam 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/22] | Maureau, Bernard, et al Cabinet Germain, Maureau et Millet Conseils en Brevets d'Invention 64, rue d'Amsterdam F-75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401651.9 | 08.08.1984 | [1985/22] | Priority number, date | FR19830014859 | 19.09.1983 Original published format: FR 8314859 | [1985/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0143009 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0143009 | Date: | 25.03.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | E01D15/14, B60F3/00 | [1985/22] | CPC: |
B60F3/0061 (EP,US);
E01D15/22 (EP,US);
B63B35/086 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/22] | Title | German: | Amphibisches Fahrzeug verwendbar als eine selbständige Fähre und als eine Schwimmbrücke | [1985/22] | English: | Amphibious vehicle able to serve as a self-contained ferry and able to form a floating bridge | [1985/22] | French: | Véhicule amphibie pouvant servir de bac autonome et pouvant former un pont flottant | [1985/22] | Examination procedure | 09.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/38] | 26.03.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.06.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 23.09.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2013032 (MAMBRETTI RICCARDO); | [A]FR1592501 ; | [A]FR1603771 ; | [A]FR2271117 (FRANCE ETAT [FR]); | [A]FR2358314 (PRONAL SA [FR]); | [A]US4328601 (RODLER JR WALDO E, et al); | [AD]FR2500504 (GOEPPNER KAISERSLAUTERN EISEN [DE]) |