EP0134177 - Drill rods particularly for gas or oil wells with a zone for receiving the holding slips [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1985/11] | Drill rods for gas or oil wells with a zone for receiving the holding slips | ||
[1990/03] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1990 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1990 [1990/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALLOUREC Société Anonyme dite. 7, place du Chancelier Adenauer F-75116 Paris / FR | [1985/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fillet, Pierre René 64, rue du Surmelin F-75020 Paris / FR | [1985/11] | Representative(s) | Leszczynski, André, et al Cabinet Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1989/43] | Leszczynski, André, et al NONY & ASSOCIES 29, rue Cambacérès F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [1985/11] | Nony, Michel Cabinet Nony 29, rue Cambacérès F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401679.0 | 16.08.1984 | [1985/11] | Priority number, date | FR19830013379 | 17.08.1983 Original published format: FR 8313379 | [1985/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0134177 | Date: | 13.03.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0134177 | Date: | 17.01.1990 | Language: | FR | [1990/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1984 | Classification | IPC: | E21B17/00 | [1985/11] | CPC: |
E21B17/00 (EP,US);
F16L37/1215 (EP,US);
Y10T403/7054 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, GB, IT, NL, SE [1985/11] | Title | German: | Bohrgestänge insbesondere für Gas- oder Erdölbohrungen mit einer für Haltekeile vorgesehenen Zone | [1990/03] | English: | Drill rods particularly for gas or oil wells with a zone for receiving the holding slips | [1990/03] | French: | Tiges de forage en particulier pour puits de pétrole ou de gaz comportant une zone destinée à recevoir les mâchoires de serrage | [1985/11] |
Former [1985/11] | Bohrgestänge für Gas- oder Erdölbohrungen mit einer für Haltekeile vorgesehenen Zone | ||
Former [1985/11] | Drill rods for gas or oil wells with a zone for receiving the holding slips | Examination procedure | 19.04.1985 | Examination requested [1985/28] | 29.01.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.05.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 28.03.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 15.06.1989 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 26.06.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.10.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.07.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1811939 (JOHANSEN HARRY C); | [Y]FR1061275 (MANNESMANN AG); | [A]FR1125485 ; | [A]FR1232884 (HUGHES TOOL CO); | [A]US3107930 (GIBBS JOE W, et al); | [A]GB1005844 (GARDNER DENVER CO); | [Y]FR2064109 (IND ONDERNEMING); | [A]FR2512134 (THEROND MARCEL [FR]) |