EP0143013 - method and device for overheating a refrigerant [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.09.1987 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PACTOLE S.A. 212 Avenue Paul Doumer 92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/22] | For all designated states PACTOLE S.A. 212 Avenue Paul Doumer F-92500 Rueil-Malmaison / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gueneau, Michel 33 Rue du Champ de Mars F-75007 Paris / FR | [1985/22] | Representative(s) | Boillot, Marc ELF AQUITAINE, Division Propriété Industrielle, Tour Elf 92078 Paris la Défense Cédex 45 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/22] | Boillot, Marc ELF AQUITAINE Division Propriété Industrielle Tour Elf F-92078 Paris la Défense Cédex 45 / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401814.3 | 13.09.1984 | [1985/22] | Priority number, date | FR19830014795 | 16.09.1983 Original published format: FR 8314795 | [1985/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0143013 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0143013 | Date: | 08.01.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.11.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F25B43/00 | [1985/22] | CPC: |
F25B43/006 (EP,US);
F25B2400/051 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/22] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Überhitzen eines Kühlmittels | [1985/22] | English: | method and device for overheating a refrigerant | [1985/22] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de surchauffe d'un fluide frigorifique | [1985/22] | File destroyed: | 01.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 17.09.1984 | Examination requested [1985/22] | 05.08.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.09.1987 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1987/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE3206967 (BEDIA MASCHF VERWALT [DE]); | [Y]US4236381 (IMRAL SADIK S, et al); | [A]US3766748 (BOTTUM E, et al); | [A]US3420071 (BOTTUM EDWARD W); | [A]GB323196 (MAX SCHLAWE, et al); | [A]GB2056646 (SCHULTZE E KG); | [A]US4217765 (ECKER AMIR L [US]); | [A]US4208887 (HUDSON SHARON J JR [US], et al); | [A]GB376713 (JEAN SABATIER); | [A]FR754234 |