EP0140740 - Safety lock [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.1988 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.1989 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.05.1989 [1989/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FICHET-BAUCHE Société dite: 15-17, avenue Morane-Saulnier F-78140 Velizy-Villacoublay Cédex / FR | [1985/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Doinel, Gérard Henri Denis 6 Place Pinot F-80460 Oustmarest par Ault / FR | [1985/19] | Representative(s) | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al Cabinet Weinstein 56 A, rue du Faubourg Saint-Honoré 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/19] | Durand, Yves Armand Louis, et al Cabinet Z. Weinstein 20, Avenue de Friedland F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 84401820.0 | 13.09.1984 | [1985/19] | Priority number, date | FR19830014789 | 16.09.1983 Original published format: FR 8314789 | FR19830014790 | 16.09.1983 Original published format: FR 8314790 | [1985/19] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0140740 | Date: | 08.05.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0140740 | Date: | 24.06.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | E05B29/00, E05B17/14 | [1985/19] | CPC: |
E05B17/186 (EP,US);
E05B29/002 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7576 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7627 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7633 (EP,US);
Y10T70/7667 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/19] | Title | German: | Sicherheitsschloss | [1985/19] | English: | Safety lock | [1985/19] | French: | Serrure de sûreté | [1985/19] | Examination procedure | 21.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/36] | 24.04.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.07.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.11.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.03.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 14.09.1987 | [1989/19] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR855330 (MUEL ET SES FILS J); | [Y]GB251106 (STANISLAW SKRZEPINSKI); | [A]US2221664 (HANS SUSSER); | [A]FR655128 ; | [A]US2032974 ; | [A]FR912442 |