EP0142404 - Switches with a pivotally supported contact arm [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1990 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.06.1990 [1990/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAGER ELECTRO S.A. Boulevard d'Europe F-67210 Obernai / FR | [1985/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roiatti, Jean-Marie 8 rue d'Obernai F-67230 Benfeld / FR | [1985/21] | Representative(s) | Lemoine, Michel, et al Cabinet Bernasconi et Vigier 13 boulevard des Batignolles F-75008 Paris / FR | [1985/21] | Application number, filing date | 84401956.2 | 01.10.1984 | [1985/21] | Priority number, date | FR19830015783 | 04.10.1983 Original published format: FR 8315783 | [1985/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0142404 | Date: | 22.05.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0142404 | Date: | 21.06.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01H73/04 | [1985/21] | CPC: |
H01H73/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1985/21] | Title | German: | Schalter mit schwenkbarem Kontaktträger | [1985/21] | English: | Switches with a pivotally supported contact arm | [1985/21] | French: | Perfectionnements apportés aux interrupteurs à porte-contact basculant | [1985/21] | Examination procedure | 12.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/13] | 22.05.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.04.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 07.05.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.10.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.06.1989 | NL | 21.06.1989 | SE | 21.06.1989 | [1990/19] |
Former [1990/12] | NL | 21.06.1989 | |
SE | 21.06.1989 | ||
Former [1989/43] | SE | 21.06.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE643986 (OERLIKON MASCHF); | [A]US3286067 (MENICKELLA MICHAEL A, et al); | [A]EP0081805 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) |