EP0136957 - Air heater and method of using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.09.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.09.1988 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.11.1988 [1988/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TAGNON, ClaudeJean-Marie 6, Place Lucien-Delahaye F-94160 Saint-Mandé / FR | [1985/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1985/15] | Representative(s) | Bruder, Michel Cabinet Bruder 46 Rue Decamps F-75116 Paris / FR | [1985/15] | Application number, filing date | 84401993.5 | 04.10.1984 | [1985/15] | Priority number, date | FR19830015767 | 04.10.1983 Original published format: FR 8315767 | [1985/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0136957 | Date: | 10.04.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0136957 | Date: | 19.02.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1985 | Classification | IPC: | F28D1/02, F24F13/14 | [1985/15] | CPC: |
F28D1/024 (EP,US);
F24F13/142 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/15] | Title | German: | Luftbeheizer und Verfahren zu seiner Anwendung | [1985/37] | English: | Air heater and method of using the same | [1985/25] | French: | Aérotherme et son procédé d'utilisation | [1985/15] | File destroyed: | 09.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 27.09.1985 | Examination requested [1985/51] | 29.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.11.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1988 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.09.1988 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1988/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US2332762 (STEMPEL EDWARD H, et al); | [XD]DE1191536 (HELIOS APPBAU K G); | [X]US2362955 (CANTWELL JOHN D) |