EP0141730 - Anchoring device for devices used for working on roofs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.1987 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.10.1987 [1987/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETS FOURNIER & CIE S.A.R.L. 22 rue du Général Dame F-59320 Haubourdin / FR | For all designated states Dallennes, Jean 146 rue du Maréchal Foch F-59211 Santes / FR | For all designated states ETABLISSEMENTS DUARIB, S.A. F-44310 Saint Philibert de Grand Lieu / FR | [1985/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fournier, André 15 rue de la Chapelle F-59840 Lompret / FR | 02 /
Dallennes, Jean 146 rue du Mal Fochn F-59211 Santes / FR | 03 /
Biraud, J. Pierre Route de la Limousinière F-44310 St. Philibert de Grand lieu / FR | [1985/20] | Representative(s) | Ecrepont, Robert Cabinet Ecrepont 27bis, rue du Vieux-Faubourg 59800 Lille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | Ecrepont, Robert Cabinet Ecrepont 12 Place Simon Vollant F-59800 Lille / FR | Application number, filing date | 84402138.6 | 24.10.1984 | [1985/20] | Priority number, date | FR19830017762 | 03.11.1983 Original published format: FR 8317762 | [1985/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0141730 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0141730 | Date: | 26.06.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0141730 | Date: | 29.10.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | E04G21/32, E04G3/12, E04G5/04 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
E04G5/04 (EP);
E04G21/3214 (EP);
E04G3/26 (EP);
E04G5/041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/20] | Title | German: | Verankerungsvorrichtung für Geräte bei Dacharbeiten | [1985/20] | English: | Anchoring device for devices used for working on roofs | [1985/20] | French: | Dispositif pour l'ancrage d'un accessoire ou matériel sur un toit | [1985/20] | Examination procedure | 12.06.1985 | Examination requested [1985/35] | 15.01.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.04.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.1987 | No opposition filed within time limit [1987/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR1351976 ; | [A]FR96231E (LOIRE ATEL FORGES [FR]); | [A]GB1541016 (COLT INT LTD) |