EP0141735 - Electrical connection security device having an obturating slider, especially for use as a current plug [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.01.1988 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sellem, Jicelin 14 Villa Normandie F-94430 Chennevieres / FR | [1986/49] |
Former [1986/06] | For all designated states Société de Fabrication Industrielle Mécanique et Electrique de Sécurité La Grande Jette F-17600 Saint-Romain-de-Benet / FR | ||
Former [1985/20] | For all designated states Laitram, Sàrl Saint-Romain-de-Benet F-17600 Saujon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martial, Lionel "La Grande Jette" Saint-Romain-de-Benêt F-17600 Saujon / FR | [1985/20] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/20] | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 84402160.0 | 26.10.1984 | [1985/20] | Priority number, date | FR19830017415 | 02.11.1983 Original published format: FR 8317415 | [1985/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0141735 | Date: | 15.05.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0141735 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.04.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H01R13/44 | [1985/20] | CPC: |
H01R13/44 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/20] | Title | German: | Elektrische Verbindungssicherheitseinrichtung mit einem Schliessschieber, insbesondere als Steckdose zu gebrauchen | [1985/20] | English: | Electrical connection security device having an obturating slider, especially for use as a current plug | [1985/20] | French: | Dispositif de connexion électrique de sécurité comportant un tiroir obturateur coulissant, utilisable en particulier sous forme de prise de courant | [1985/20] | File destroyed: | 09.08.1994 | Examination procedure | 16.12.1985 | Examination requested [1986/08] | 27.06.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.08.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.1987 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 15.05.1987 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1988/08] | 10.10.1987 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1988/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2018055 ; | [A]FR2374759 ; | [A]FR80723E |