EP0143038 - Device for the protection of electronic components in a matrix against short-circuiting [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.09.1987 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2007 | Change - inventor | published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique 31-33, rue de la Fédération, Boîte Postale 150 75752 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/22] | For all designated states COMMISSARIAT A L'ENERGIE ATOMIQUE Etablissement de Caractère Scientifique Technique et Industriel 31/33, rue de la Fédération F-75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bisotto, Sylvette 3 Rés. Beauséjour Rue Bach Le Fontanil Cornillon F-38120 Saint Egreve / FR | 02 /
Blanc, Jean-Philippe Clos Fleurs et Neige F-38410 Saint Martin d'Uriage / FR | 03 /
Bodin, Bernard 31, Le Plaçage F-38360 Sassenage / FR | 04 /
Poujois, Robert Les Jaillets F-38650 Sinard / FR | [1985/22] | Representative(s) | Mongrédien, André, et al c/o BREVATOME 25, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | [1985/22] | Application number, filing date | 84402169.1 | 29.10.1984 | [1985/22] | Priority number, date | FR19830017403 | 02.11.1983 Original published format: FR 8317403 | [1985/22] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0143038 | Date: | 29.05.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/02, H03K17/693 | [1985/22] | CPC: |
H02H9/025 (EP);
G02F1/1368 (EP);
H03K17/693 (EP);
G02F2202/104 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, NL [1985/22] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Schutz gegen Kurzschlüsse in einer Matrix von elektronischen Bauteilen | [1985/22] | English: | Device for the protection of electronic components in a matrix against short-circuiting | [1985/22] | French: | Dispositif de protection contre des courts-circuits dans une matrice de composants électroniques | [1985/22] | File destroyed: | 01.06.1993 | Examination procedure | 30.10.1985 | Examination requested [1986/03] | 28.07.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.09.1986 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 18.12.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.04.1987 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1987/47] | 27.05.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1987/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2123395 ; | [A]US4200898 (THOMPSON JAMES P [US]) |