EP0145542 - Zero insertion force connector for a rectangular clamp carrier, and closing clamp for such a connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.03.1990 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.05.1990 [1990/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCAPEX 10 bis, quai Léon Blum F-92153 Suresnes / FR | [1985/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bricaud, Hervé THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 02 /
Rouffy, Jean-Claude THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | 03 /
L'Henaff, Patrick THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | [1985/25] | Representative(s) | Hasenrader, Hubert Karl, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1987/43] | Hasenrader, Hubert, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université F-75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [1987/05] | Brullé, Jean Division Technique Service Brevets Bendix Europe 126, rue de Stalingrad F-93700 Drancy / FR | ||
Former [1985/25] | Vesin, Jacques THOMSON-CSF SCPI 173, Bld Haussmann F-75379 Paris Cedex 08 / FR | Application number, filing date | 84402226.9 | 06.11.1984 | [1985/25] | Priority number, date | FR19830017912 | 10.11.1983 Original published format: FR 8317912 | [1985/25] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0145542 | Date: | 19.06.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0145542 | Date: | 10.07.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0145542 | Date: | 17.05.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/12 | [1985/25] | CPC: |
H05K7/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1985/25] | Title | German: | Verbinder mit kräftefreier Einfügung für einen rechteckigen Chipträger und Anschliessklemme für einen solchen Verbinder | [1985/25] | English: | Zero insertion force connector for a rectangular clamp carrier, and closing clamp for such a connector | [1985/25] | French: | Connecteur à force d'insertion nulle pour support rectangulaire de circuit, et pince de fermeture pour un tel connecteur | [1985/25] | Examination procedure | 27.07.1985 | Examination requested [1985/40] | 02.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: {0}) | 03.09.1986 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1987 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.04.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.07.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.02.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/20] | Request for further processing for: | 02.04.1987 | Request for further processing filed | 02.04.1987 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.05.1987 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.10.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB935565 (GEN ELECTRIC CO LTD, et al); | [A]DE2539379 (REINSHAGEN KABELWERK GMBH); | [A]US4172626 (OLSSON BILLY E [US]); | [A]US4235500 (BELOPAVLOVICH PETER [US], et al) | Examination | EP0118346 | EP0146242 | - MIL-S-38533 |