EP0148054 - Articulated effecter for an industrial robot, and robot equipped with such an effecter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.1988 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.04.1988 [1988/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Barland, Michel 32, Allées Paulmy F-64100 Bayonne / FR | [1986/38] |
Former [1985/28] | For all designated states Barland, Michel 32, Allées Paulmy F-64100 Bayonne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1986/38] |
Former [1985/28] | 01 /
Barland, Michel 32 Allées Paulmy F-64100 Bayonne / FR | Representative(s) | Loriot, Jacques, et al S.A. FEDIT-LORIOT (Cabinet Guerbilsky) 38 avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/28] | Loriot, Jacques, et al S.A. FEDIT-LORIOT (Cabinet Guerbilsky) 38 avenue Hoche F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 84402473.7 | 03.12.1984 | [1985/28] | Priority number, date | FR19840000069 | 04.01.1984 Original published format: FR 8400069 | [1985/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0148054 | Date: | 10.07.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0148054 | Date: | 22.04.1987 | Language: | FR | [1987/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1985 | Classification | IPC: | B25J17/02 | [1985/28] | CPC: |
B25J17/0283 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, SE [1985/28] | Title | German: | Gelenkkopf für Roboter und Roboter ausgestattet mit einem derartigen Gelenkkopf | [1985/28] | English: | Articulated effecter for an industrial robot, and robot equipped with such an effecter | [1985/28] | French: | Tête articulée pour robot industriel et robot équipé d'une telle tête | [1985/28] | Examination procedure | 31.05.1985 | Examination requested [1985/34] | 16.09.1986 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.10.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.1987 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.1987 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.1988 | No opposition filed within time limit [1988/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2310842 ; | [A]EP0074882 ; | [A]EP0085307 |