EP0148668 - Plasmid cloning and expression vectors for a protein in a microorganism, comprising at least the expression promotor of beta-glucosidase in the yeasts; these vectors containing microorganisms; fermentation process and enzymes so obtained [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.1990 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Etablissement Public dit: CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 15, Quai Anatole France 75007 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/29] | For all designated states Etablissement Public dit: CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 15, Quai Anatole France F-75007 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guerineau, Michel 45, rue St Placide F-75006 Paris / FR | 02 /
Raynal, Alain 68, rue St Nicolas F-91940 Gomez Lechatel / FR | [1985/29] | Representative(s) | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/29] | Warcoin, Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau, 26, avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 84402482.8 | 04.12.1984 | [1985/29] | Priority number, date | FR19830019494 | 06.12.1983 Original published format: FR 8319494 | [1985/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0148668 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0148668 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0148668 | Date: | 13.09.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/00, C12P21/02, C12N1/16, // (C12N1/16, C12R1:865) | [1985/29] | CPC: |
C12Y302/01021 (EP,US);
C12N15/815 (EP,US);
C12N9/2445 (EP,US);
Y02E50/10 (EP);
Y10S435/942 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/29] | Title | German: | Klonierungs- und Expressionsplasmidvektoren für ein Protein in einem Mikroorganismus die mindestens den Expressionspromotor von beta-Glucosidase in den Hefen enthalten, dieselben enthaltende Mikroorganismen, Gärungsverfahren und erhaltene Enzyme | [1985/29] | English: | Plasmid cloning and expression vectors for a protein in a microorganism, comprising at least the expression promotor of beta-glucosidase in the yeasts; these vectors containing microorganisms; fermentation process and enzymes so obtained | [1985/29] | French: | Vecteurs plasmidiques de clonage et d'expression d'une protéine dans un micro-organisme, comportant au moins le promoteur d'expression de la beta-glucosidase dans les levures; micro-organismes les contenant; procédé de fermentation et enzymes obtenues | [1985/29] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 14.10.1985 | Examination requested [1985/51] | 26.02.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.03.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1988 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.08.1988 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.10.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.02.1989 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1989 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1989 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.06.1990 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.09.1989 | GB | 13.09.1989 | IT | 13.09.1989 | NL | 13.09.1989 | SE | 13.09.1989 | BE | 31.12.1989 | CH | 31.12.1989 | LI | 31.12.1989 | LU | 31.12.1989 | [1999/52] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 13.09.1989 | |
GB | 13.09.1989 | ||
IT | 13.09.1989 | ||
NL | 13.09.1989 | ||
SE | 13.09.1989 | ||
BE | 31.12.1989 | ||
CH | 31.12.1989 | ||
LI | 31.12.1989 | ||
Former [1991/17] | AT | 13.09.1989 | |
GB | 13.09.1989 | ||
NL | 13.09.1989 | ||
SE | 13.09.1989 | ||
BE | 31.12.1989 | ||
CH | 31.12.1989 | ||
LI | 31.12.1989 | ||
Former [1991/08] | AT | 13.09.1989 | |
GB | 13.09.1989 | ||
NL | 13.09.1989 | ||
SE | 13.09.1989 | ||
CH | 31.12.1989 | ||
LI | 31.12.1989 | ||
Former [1990/42] | AT | 13.09.1989 | |
GB | 13.09.1989 | ||
NL | 13.09.1989 | ||
SE | 13.09.1989 | ||
Former [1990/19] | NL | 13.09.1989 | |
SE | 13.09.1989 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]FR2489363 (PASTEUR INSTITUT [FR]) | [Y] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 72, no. 8, 1981, page 5388, no. 51899, Philadelphia, US; R.W. ARMENTROUT et al.: "Molecular cloning of genes for cellobiose utilization and their expression in Escherichia coli" & APPL. ENVIRON. MICROBIOL. 41(6): 1355-1362, 1981 | [Y] - BIOLOGICAL ABSTRACTS, RRM, no. 21003547, Philadelphia, US; S.K. PICATAGGIO et al.: "The cloning of trichoderma-reeseigenomic DNA in Escherichia-coli HB-101" & ABSTRACTS OF THE ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY (USA) 1981, vol. 81, no. P116 |