EP0152713 - Sports training apparatuses [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 29.12.1999 [1999/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JEAN BREL S.A. Société Anonyme dite 4, Place Paul Langevin F-93200 Saint Denis / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | For all designated states JEAN BREL S.A. Société Anonyme dite 4, Place Paul Langevin F-93200 Saint Denis / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brel, Jean 11, avenue Jean Moulin F-93200 Saint Denis / FR | 02 /
Brel, Jean Jacques 4, rue Jacques Woog F-93200 Saint Denis / FR | 03 /
Daveau, Jean Paul 15, rue Victor Hugo F-37210 Vouvray / FR | 04 /
Lemettre, Jean Philippe Le Temple, Francueil F-37150 Blère / FR | [1988/38] |
Former [1985/35] | 01 /
Brel, Jean 11, avenue Jean Moulin F-93200 Saint Denis / FR | ||
02 /
Brel, Jean Jacques 4, rue Jacques Woog F-93200 Saint Denis / FR | |||
03 /
Daveau, Jean Paul 15, rue Victor Hugo F-37210 Vouvray / FR | |||
04 /
Lemettre, Jean Philippe Le Temple, Francueil F-37150 Blere / FR | Representative(s) | Lepage, Jean-Pierre Cabinet Lemoine & Associés 86, Boulevard Carnot 59000 Lille / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/35] | Lepage, Jean-Pierre Cabinet Lemoine & Associés, 30, Boulevard de la Liberté F-59800 Lille / FR | Application number, filing date | 84402720.1 | 26.12.1984 | [1985/35] | Priority number, date | FR19840002243 | 07.02.1984 Original published format: FR 8402243 | [1985/35] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0152713 | Date: | 28.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0152713 | Date: | 21.09.1988 | Language: | FR | [1988/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.1985 | Classification | IPC: | A63B69/00 | [1985/35] | CPC: |
A63B71/0686 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/35] | Title | German: | Sportliche Trainingsgeräte | [1985/35] | English: | Sports training apparatuses | [1985/35] | French: | Perfectionnement aux appareils entraineurs de sportifs | [1985/35] | Examination procedure | 26.02.1986 | Examination requested [1986/18] | 16.03.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.03.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1989/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.12.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.09.1988 | NL | 21.09.1988 | SE | 21.09.1988 | LU | 31.12.1988 | [1999/52] |
Former [1989/46] | AT | 21.09.1988 | |
NL | 21.09.1988 | ||
SE | 21.09.1988 | ||
Former [1989/41] | NL | 21.09.1988 | |
SE | 21.09.1988 | ||
Former [1989/24] | SE | 21.09.1988 | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]FR2105662 (VIDEMENT JEAN); | [AD]FR2155149 (BREL JEAN); | [Y]EP0028209 (SMIDAK EMIL F) |