EP0148700 - Method and device to control a space heating installation, comprising a plurality of heat generators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.11.1989 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.01.1990 [1990/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE Service National, 2, rue Louis Murat 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/29] | For all designated states ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE Service National 2, rue Louis Murat F-75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pichot, Jacky 4, rue Haute-La-Grande Paroisse F-77130 Montereau / FR | 02 /
Oddou, Jacques 18, rue Carnot F-77300 Fontainebleau / FR | [1985/29] | Representative(s) | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Régimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1985/29] | Martin, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet REGIMBEAU 26, Avenue Kléber F-75116 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 84402724.3 | 27.12.1984 | [1985/29] | Priority number, date | FR19840000214 | 09.01.1984 Original published format: FR 8400214 | [1985/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0148700 | Date: | 17.07.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0148700 | Date: | 21.08.1985 | Language: | FR | [1985/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0148700 | Date: | 01.02.1989 | Language: | FR | [1989/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.1985 | Classification | IPC: | G05D23/20 | [1985/29] | CPC: |
F24D12/02 (EP,US);
G05D23/1931 (EP,US);
G05D23/20 (EP,US);
F24D2200/043 (EP,US);
F24D2200/12 (EP,US);
Y02B30/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1985/29] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Regelung für eine Raumheizungsanlage, die mehrere Wärmequellen aufweist | [1985/29] | English: | Method and device to control a space heating installation, comprising a plurality of heat generators | [1985/29] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de régulation d'une installation de chauffage de locaux comprenant plusieurs générateurs de chauffage | [1985/29] | Examination procedure | 04.11.1985 | Examination requested [1986/03] | 01.06.1987 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1987 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.03.1988 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.07.1988 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1988 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1988 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1989 | No opposition filed within time limit [1990/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.12.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.1987 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2436337 (FONDERIE SOC GEN DE); | [A]EP0049215 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0056445 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0070471 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]EP0076398 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]EP0089567 (VAILLANT JOH GMBH & CO [DE]); | [P]EP0113262 (ELECTRICITE DE FRANCE [FR]) |