EP0118375 - Simplified method for the high-speed spinning of polyamide [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 02.02.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC FIBRES 129, rue Servient 69003 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1984/37] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC FIBRES 129, rue Servient F-69003 Lyon / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Double, Jean-Pierre 3, Impasse des Chaux F-69340 Francheville / FR | 02 /
Lecluse, Cécile 105, rue Garibaldi F-69006 Lyon / FR | [1984/37] | Representative(s) | Braconnier, Daniel, et al RHONE-POULENC FIBRES Direction Technique Brevets Boîte Postal 82-41 F-69355 Lyon Cédex 2 / FR | [1984/37] | Application number, filing date | 84420026.1 | 13.02.1984 | [1984/37] | Priority number, date | FR19830002627 | 16.02.1983 Original published format: FR 8302627 | [1984/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0118375 | Date: | 12.09.1984 | Language: | FR | [1984/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0118375 | Date: | 03.09.1986 | Language: | FR | [1986/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1984 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/60, D01D5/08 | [1984/37] | CPC: |
D01F6/60 (EP,US);
D01D5/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL [1984/37] | Title | German: | Vereinfachtes Verfahren zum Schnellspinnen von Polyamid | [1984/37] | English: | Simplified method for the high-speed spinning of polyamide | [1984/37] | French: | Procédé simplifié de filage de polyamide à grande vitesse | [1984/37] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1984 | Examination requested [1984/50] | 20.06.1985 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1985 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1985 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 21.02.1986 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.1986 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.1986 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.05.1987
16.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE Metallgesellschaft AG, Frankfurt/M -ZA Recht und Patente- Reuterweg 14 Postfach 10 15 01 D-60271 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Rieger, Harald Reuterweg 14 60323 Frankfurt / DE | 02
28.05.1987
16.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE Didier Engineering GmbH Alfredstrasse 28 Postfach 100945 D-4300 Essen 1 / DE Opponent's representative Masch, Karl Gerhard Patentanwälte, Andrejewski, Honke & Sozien, Postfach 10 02 54 45002 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1987/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.05.1987
16.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE Metallgesellschaft AG, Frankfurt/M -ZA Recht und Patente- Reuterweg 14 Postfach 10 15 01 D-60271 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Rieger, Harald, Dr. Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | ||
02
28.05.1987
16.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE Didier Engineering GmbH Alfredstrasse 28 Postfach 100945 D-4300 Essen 1 / DE Opponent's representative Masch, Karl Gerhard, Dr. Patentanwälte, Andrejewski, Honke & Partner, Postfach 10 02 54 D-45002 Essen / DE | |||
Former [1987/30] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.05.1987
16.07.1987
ADMISSIBLE Metallgesellschaft AG, Frankfurt/M -ZA Recht und Patente- Reuterweg 14 Postfach 10 15 01 D-60271 Frankfurt am Main / DE Opponent's representative Rieger, Harald, Dr. Reuterweg 14 D-60323 Frankfurt / DE | 05.08.1987 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 21.11.1987 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 14.12.1987 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 30.01.1988 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 06.03.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.1989 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 08.11.1990 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 30.01.1993 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1993/12] | Appeal following opposition | 07.01.1991 | Appeal received No. T0028/91 | 01.03.1991 | Statement of grounds filed | 23.03.1992 | Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1992/13] | 15.04.1992 | Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1992/16] | 20.10.1992 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1986 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]FR2277913 (TEIJIN LTD [JP]); | [X]US4247505 (JACKSON HENRY G); | [A]FR2400573 (MONSANTO CO [US]) |